U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07013
  • Case Name: Ahlgren v. John Hancock Life Insurance Company d/b/a John Han
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 26, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • June 26, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • June 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Stipulation]
  • June 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • May 23, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
  • May 23, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 22, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • March 21, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • March 21, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • March 21, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • March 21, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Request to Reissue Summons]
  • March 21, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 15, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • February 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • February 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 15, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • February 15, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.