U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-07016
  • Case Name: Thompson et al v. Refugio County Tax Assessor/Collector et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 04, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
April, 2018
  • April 21, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • April 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • April 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amended Motion]
  • April 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • April 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • April 03, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BAP re: Appeal]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 29, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • March 28, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Clerk's Notice of Fees Due]
  • March 28, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Transmittal of Complete Record on Appeal]
  • March 28, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election]
February, 2018
  • February 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 15, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Party]
  • February 15, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Attorney Fees]
  • February 15, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Contempt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.