U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30085
  • Case Name: Randall Minnerup
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • June 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approve Stipulation]
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.