U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07014
  • Case Name: Bala et al v. State of North Dakota et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • November 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Plaintiff]
  • November 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
  • November 20, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • September 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
  • May 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • February 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • February 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.