U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30091
  • Case Name: Charity Hope Erickson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • June 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Compel Abandonment (no fee)]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Compel Abandonment (no fee)]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • February 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.