U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07016
  • Case Name: Ahlgren v. Mohr et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • September 13, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pay AP Filing Fee]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • June 24, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Plaintiff]
  • June 19, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • July 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • July 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Returned Mail]
  • July 10, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • July 09, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • July 09, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • April 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • April 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Request to Reissue Summons]
  • April 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
March, 2018
  • March 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • February 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • February 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.