U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07015
  • Case Name: Ahlgren v. Bank of America, N.A.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pay AP Filing Fee]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 22, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • October 22, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • October 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Stipulation]
  • October 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 10, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • September 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • May 22, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • May 09, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • May 08, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • April 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Appear pro hac vice]
  • April 17, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 17, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Appear pro hac vice]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • February 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • February 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.