U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07019
  • Case Name: Ahlgren v. Prairies Edge Properties, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • September 13, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Pay AP Filing Fee]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Close Adversary Case]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 26, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Default Judgment]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 22, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Order (Generic)]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Default Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Summons Service Executed]
  • February 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Summons Issued]
  • February 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.