U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-07020
  • Case Name: Ahlgren v. C & M Ford Sales, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • January 02, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 14, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • September 07, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • August 29, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amended Answer]
  • August 29, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • August 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 11, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amend]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amend]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • March 27, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • March 26, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.