U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 04-30236
  • Case Name: Racing Services, Inc. and North Dakota Racing Commission
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Compensation]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Compensation]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Hearing Held]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Hearing Held]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reply]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Reply]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Response]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Response]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Objection]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Objection]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Compensation]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Compensation]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Limit Notice]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Limit Notice]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Limit Notice]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Limit Notice]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Correspondence]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Correspondence]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Correspondence]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Correspondence]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Adversary Case]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Close Adversary Case]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Update Claim]
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Update Claim]
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reply]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Reply]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Redact]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Redact]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Redact (Fee Per Case)]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Redact (Fee Per Case)]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Post-Trial Documents]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Post-Trial Documents]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reply]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Reply]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Transcript]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Transcript]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Extend Time]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Extend Time]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Extend Time]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Extend Time]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Affidavit]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Affidavit]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Order on Generic Motion]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Order on Generic Motion]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Hearing Held]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Hearing Held]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Affidavit]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Affidavit]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Brief]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Brief]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Objection]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Objection]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Response]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Response]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Correspondence]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Correspondence]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Summons Service Executed]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Summons Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.