U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07022
  • Case Name: BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. McMartin, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • March 30, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amend]
  • March 12, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amend]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • February 26, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Memorandum and Order]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
  • November 06, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Post-Trial Documents]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
  • October 30, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Post-Trial Documents]
  • October 05, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Transcript]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • September 17, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • September 16, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • September 15, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Limine]
  • September 15, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Exhibit List]
  • September 14, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Exhibit List]
  • September 11, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
  • September 10, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
  • September 10, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Objection]
  • September 09, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Witness List]
  • September 04, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • September 03, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • September 02, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • September 02, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Reduce Time]
  • September 01, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Reduce Time]
  • September 01, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Limine]
  • September 01, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Exhibit List]
  • September 01, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • September 01, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Witness List]
  • September 01, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order on Generic Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Reply]
  • August 31, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order on Generic Motion]
  • August 28, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Objection]
  • August 24, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Reduce Time]
  • August 24, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [xGeneric Motion (CALL COURT BEFORE USING)]
  • August 21, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Reduce Time]
  • August 21, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [xGeneric Motion (CALL COURT BEFORE USING)]
  • August 21, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
  • August 18, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • August 18, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • August 17, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • August 13, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Objection to Deposition Designation]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • July 30, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • July 30, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amend]
  • July 30, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Reduce Time]
  • July 29, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amend]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • February 14, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • February 14, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 06, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • February 06, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
January, 2020
  • January 20, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 20, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • January 20, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
  • January 15, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • January 15, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • January 15, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • January 14, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
  • January 13, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 10, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
  • January 08, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • January 08, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • January 08, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • January 07, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
  • January 06, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • January 06, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • January 06, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
  • January 06, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 02, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • December 19, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • December 19, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • December 18, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
  • December 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 13, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • October 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • October 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • September 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • September 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
  • August 07, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • August 07, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • August 02, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
  • August 02, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • March 19, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amend]
  • March 18, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Reply]
  • March 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
  • March 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Transcript]
  • March 06, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • March 06, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • March 05, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
  • March 05, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amend]
  • March 05, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
  • March 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • January 18, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order on Generic Motion]
  • January 18, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [xGeneric Motion (CALL COURT BEFORE USING)]
  • January 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • January 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order on Generic Motion]
  • January 02, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [xGeneric Motion (CALL COURT BEFORE USING)]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • September 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • September 14, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • September 13, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • September 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • August 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 03, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • August 02, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • August 02, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • August 02, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • July 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • July 10, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Oral Argument]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Request for Oral Argument]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 02, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Motion (21 day objection period)]
  • March 28, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • March 07, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • March 01, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • February 28, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 28, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.