U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07017
  • Case Name: Ahlgren v. Dakotaland Springbrook, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • September 13, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pay AP Filing Fee]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
August, 2018
  • August 01, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • July 30, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • July 21, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Stipulation]
  • July 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 15, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • June 15, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Cancelled]
  • May 09, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • May 09, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • May 08, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • April 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • March 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • March 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • March 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Request to Reissue Summons]
  • March 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.