U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30162
  • Case Name: Shawn Dennis McDowell and Erin McDowell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Discharge]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • May 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment of Installment Fee-Chapter 7]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.