U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30166
  • Case Name: Katie Joanne Midgarden
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
July, 2018
  • July 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2018
  • March 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.