U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07024
  • Case Name: Doeling v. G & K Services, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • July 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Plaintiff]
  • July 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 03, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
June, 2018
  • June 01, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • June 01, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • April 03, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • April 03, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 03, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.