U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30183
  • Case Name: Troy J. Maupin and Kristina L. Maupin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reply of No Objection]
  • October 27, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
  • October 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled]
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Modify Plan]
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Modify Plan (After Confirmation)]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Cure Order]
  • February 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • February 12, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Cure Order]
  • February 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Transfer of Claim with BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Transfer of Claim]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Update Claim]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled (Confirmation)]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Claim]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Claim]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • April 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment Advices]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.