U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30185
  • Case Name: Josh David Wiggins
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Final Account]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approving Trustees Final Report]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Final Report]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Final Report]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sell Property Free and Clear under Section 363(f)]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Affidavit]
  • July 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Order (Generic)]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Correspondence]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Order (Generic)]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sell Property Free and Clear under Section 363(f)]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Assets]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • June 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Waive Filing Fee]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amend Application]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Objection]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Application (Call Court before using)]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Waive Filing Fee]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Waive Filing Fee]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.