U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 12-30898
  • Case Name: Doris Elsie Stroh
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTERS Other than 7]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certification of Domestic Support Obligations]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Notice Regarding Domestic Support Obligation]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon completion)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.