U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30199
  • Case Name: Whittney Klose
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Delay Discharge]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Update EOUST Stats]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement of Intent]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Schedu1es A-J]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
  • April 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.