U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30200
  • Case Name: Shane A. Boschee
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • August 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Financial Management Course]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Appointment Rejection (To be used within 7 days of filing)]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Appointment Rejection (To be used within 7 days of filing)]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Document]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Document]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.