U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30205
  • Case Name: Wallace J. Holter, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon dismissal)]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • June 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Dismissal]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
  • January 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Approve Stipulation]
  • January 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • January 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • January 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Exhibit List]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
  • January 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reply of No Objection]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled]
  • October 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • September 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • September 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled (Confirmation)]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment Advices]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income Form 122C-1]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedu1es A-J]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.