U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07025
  • Case Name: Doeling v. Berset
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
September, 2018
  • September 22, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • September 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • September 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Plaintiff]
  • September 08, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • August 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
July, 2018
  • July 03, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • July 03, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • June 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • June 08, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • June 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
  • May 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • May 23, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • April 23, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • April 23, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 23, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.