U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07027
  • Case Name: Velde v. Blomquist et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • June 07, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • June 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • June 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • May 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • April 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • April 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • April 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.