U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07028
  • Case Name: Portal Investments, LLC v. Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • January 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • January 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
  • August 10, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • June 13, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • April 26, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • April 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.