U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30235
  • Case Name: Kristine L. Nordman
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Final Account]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Approving Trustees Final Report]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Final Report]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Final Report]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Update Claim]
  • September 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Adversary Case]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Complaint]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Continue Hearing]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Order (Generic)]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Hearing Held]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Document]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Objection]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Continue Hearing]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Exhibit List]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Witness List]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Continue Hearing]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Exhibit]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Response]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Returned Mail]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Objection to Claim]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Assets]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
April, 2018
  • April 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.