U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07029
  • Case Name: Velde v. Northdale Oil, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • December 10, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • December 10, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • September 11, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • August 02, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • August 02, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • August 02, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • July 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • July 11, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
  • July 03, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Motion (21 day objection period)]
  • June 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • April 30, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • April 30, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • April 27, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • April 27, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.