U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30254
  • Case Name: Gary Klein
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Final Account]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Report of Unclaimed Funds/Funds Less Than 5.00]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustees Report]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Approving Trustees Final Report]
  • August 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Application for Compensation (Without Notice)]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Report of Sale - Text Event]
  • July 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Report of Sale]
March, 2019
  • March 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Sale of Property Under Section 363 (b)]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Adversary Case]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Hearing Cancelled]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Substitute Attorney ]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Continue Hearing]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Discharge]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Substitute Attorney]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Complaint]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Substitution of Attorney]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Continue Hearing]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Stipulation]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Motion (14 day objection period)]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Joinder]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Objection]
  • June 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Assets]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Objection]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.