U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30251
  • Case Name: Larry Martin Cain and Reneshia Lashawn Johnson Cain
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • December 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Cancelled]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
October, 2018
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Response]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Time]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Time]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Dismiss Case for Abuse]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Presumed Abuse]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices-Joint Debtor]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.