U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30255
  • Case Name: Ann K. Porter and Patrick J. Porter
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Document]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Document]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon dismissal)]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case under 521(i)]
  • May 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reduce Time]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case under 521(a)(1)]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Comply]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.