U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07031
  • Case Name: Ahlgren v. McMartin, Sr. et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Compel]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • October 03, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 13, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
July, 2018
  • July 03, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • July 03, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • June 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • June 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • June 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • May 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amended Answer]
  • May 23, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 23, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 04, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • May 03, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • May 03, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.