U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 10-30174
  • Case Name: Bruce Flach and Tina Flach
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
July, 2018
  • July 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Avoid Lien]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Avoid Lien]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Avoid Lien]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reopen Chapter 7]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reopen Chapter 7 Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.