U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30269
  • Case Name: Sheena Marie Ganje
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • September 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reopen Chapter 7]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Entry of Discharge]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reopen Chapter 7 Case]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Case Closed Without Discharge]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
May, 2018
  • May 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.