U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30273
  • Case Name: George Ruggles and Tracy Ruggles
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon dismissal)]
June, 2019
  • June 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Cancelled (Confirmation)]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reply of No Objection]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Continue Hearing]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Continue Hearing]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Financial Management Course]
  • July 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Continue Hearing]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Rescheduled Mtg of Cred And Appt of New Trustee]
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Successor Trustee]
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee Resignation and Report of No Distribution]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • May 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advices]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.