U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30296
  • Case Name: Rebecca Ellen Martin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [UST Statement of Declination]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Statement of Presumed Abuse]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
May, 2018
  • May 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Payment Advices]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.