U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30299
  • Case Name: Shaun Dexter and DeeAnn Dexter
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement of Intent]
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Schedu1es A-J]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • May 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.