U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30314
  • Case Name: Michael Woodbury and Julie Woodbury
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon dismissal)]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Turnover/Disgorge Fees]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismissing Case]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Convert Case 13 to 7 Voluntarily by Debtor]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Party]
May, 2018
  • May 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Schedules]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.