U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-07028
  • Case Name: Ahlgren v. Blomquist et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • November 09, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Compel]
  • August 01, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • August 01, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • July 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • July 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Affidavit]
  • July 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • July 17, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Compel]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • June 07, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • June 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.