U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30326
  • Case Name: Mitchell R. Preskey and Joanie R. Preskey
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 12 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon dismissal)]
  • July 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • July 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Dismissal]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order (Generic)]
  • May 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • May 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Affidavit]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Administrative Expenses]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Administrative Expenses]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Close Adversary Case]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • October 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
  • September 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Exhibit]
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Affidavit]
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Misc Notice]
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Confirming Chapter 12 Plan]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Addendum to Plan]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Chapter 12 Plan]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
March, 2019
  • March 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Witness List]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Exhibit List]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Witness List]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Exhibit List]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Motion (14 day objection period)]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Chapter 12 Plan]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Document]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 12 Plan]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Held]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Exhibit List]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Witness List]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Exhibit List]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Witness List]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Exhibit List]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order to Set Hearing]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case (21 day notice)]
  • January 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Brief]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Chapter 12 Plan]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order (Generic)]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 12 Plan]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Held]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Held]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Affidavit of Noncompliance]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Complaint]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Witness List]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Exhibit List]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Exhibit List]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
  • November 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • November 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Chapter 12 Plan]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order (Generic)]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Stipulation]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Witness List]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Exhibit List]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedule G]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedule C]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedule A/B]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • September 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Transfer of Claim with BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Transfer of Claim]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case (21 day notice)]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 12 Plan]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Stipulation]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Employ]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Set(Motion)]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order (Generic)]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedu1es A-J]
  • July 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Application (14 day notice)]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Document]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Employ]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order to Set Hearing]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Time]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Time]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.