U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30336
  • Case Name: Julie Ann Jensen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2018
  • September 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Update EOUST Stats]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement of Intent]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Schedu1es A-J]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Send Document/Notice to BNC for Service]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Misc Notice]
  • June 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.