U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30341
  • Case Name: Louie L Slominski
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Audio CD Request]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Final Account]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approving Trustees Final Report]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Final Report]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Final Report]
  • March 12, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Transfer of Claim with BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Transfer of Claim]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Report of Sale - Text Event]
October, 2019
  • October 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Claim]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approve Stipulation]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Settlement Agreement]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice Appointing Trustee]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sale of Property Under Section 363 (b)]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sale Agreement]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Report of Sale]
  • February 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sale of Property Under Section 363 (b)]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reduce Time]
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Report of Sale]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reduce Time]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Discharge]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Response]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • December 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sale of Property Under Section 363 (b)]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Abandonment]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approve Stipulation]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Settlement Agreement]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sale of Property Under Section 363 (b)]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Examination]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sale Agreement]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Examination]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Examination]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Turnover Property]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Examination]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Turnover Property]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Turnover Property]
  • October 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Substitute Attorney ]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Time]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Examination]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Response]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Time (with 14 day Notice)]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Audio CD Request]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Termination or Absence of Stay]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Set(Motion)]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reply of No Objection]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Motion (14 day objection period)]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Examination]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continue Hearing]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Cancelled]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Response]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continue Hearing]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Discharge]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Substitute Attorney]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Turnover Property]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Confirm Termination or Absence of Stay]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Abandon]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Document]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reply of No Objection]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reduce Time]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion to Abandon by Trustee]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • August 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Turnover Property]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Convert Case to 12]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Assets]
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Response]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Joinder]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continue Hearing]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Response]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continue Hearing]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Motion (14 day objection period)]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Convert Case to 12]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Response]
  • July 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approve Refund of Filing Fee]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Motion (14 day objection period)]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Turnover Property]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continue Hearing]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Time]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Redact]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Redact (Fee Per Case)]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Request for Redaction]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Update EOUST Stats]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Intent]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedu1es A-J]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation Form 122A-2]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Refund of Filing Fee]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Involuntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.