U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30342
  • Case Name: Troy Wade Krogstad
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Final Account]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approving Trustees Final Report]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Final Report]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Final Report]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Report of Sale - Text Event]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approve Stipulation]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Settlement Agreement]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Contempt]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • October 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Assets]
September, 2018
  • September 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Turnover Property]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Response]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Turnover Property]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.