U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30343
  • Case Name: Dorian Joy Frost
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2018
  • September 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Additional Creditor (Fee)]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement of Intent]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Schedu1es A-J]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation Form 122A-2]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.