U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30365
  • Case Name: Michael Lee Anderson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Judgment]
  • August 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Order (Generic)]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Misc Notice]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Assets]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Order (Generic)]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Hearing Held]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Stipulation]
October, 2018
  • October 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Response]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Objection to Homestead Exemption]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.