U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30364
  • Case Name: Joshua David Soeby and Holly Dawn Soeby
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Final Account]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Pay AP Filing Fee]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approving Trustees Final Report]
  • December 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Final Report]
  • December 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Final Report]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Report of Sale - Text Event]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Provisional Order Employing]
  • August 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • January 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Response]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • January 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Motion (Call Court before using)]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Proof of Claim Attachment 3001(c)(1) and (d)]
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sell Property Free and Clear under Section 363(f)]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Adversary Case]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • October 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approve Stipulation]
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Settlement Agreement]
  • August 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Assets]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Complaint]
September, 2018
  • September 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • September 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.