U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07036
  • Case Name: Doeling v. Mohr
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • May 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • January 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • January 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • January 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • January 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • January 02, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Exhibit]
  • December 31, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
November, 2018
  • November 11, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 09, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Compel]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Compel]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • August 13, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • August 08, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • August 07, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held (Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference)]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • July 26, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • June 27, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • June 27, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • June 27, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.