U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30408
  • Case Name: Raymond John Tollerud and Michelle Ann Tollerud
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 12 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon dismissal)]
  • August 02, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • July 31, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case]
  • July 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Motion (21 day objection period)]
  • July 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order (Generic)]
  • June 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Held]
  • June 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Affidavit]
  • May 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Brief]
  • May 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Motion (21 day objection period)]
  • May 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case (21 day notice)]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Administrative Expenses]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Administrative Expenses]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364]
  • August 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Affidavit]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Set(Motion)]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Expedite Hearing]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Expedite Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Confirming Chapter 12 Plan]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Update Claim]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Confirming Chapter 12 Plan]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Chapter 12 Plan]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Held]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Witness List]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Exhibit]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Schedules]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Chapter 12 Plan]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Schedules]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 12 Plan]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Additional Creditor (Fee)]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Schedules]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Time]
  • October 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Time]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Additional Creditor (Fee)]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Correspondence]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment Advices-Joint Debtor]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Update EOUST Stats]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedu1es A-J]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Additional Creditor (Fee)]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Employ]
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Time]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Employ]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.