U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30407
  • Case Name: Nadeen Jackowski
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • November 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
September, 2018
  • September 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
August, 2018
  • August 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Intent]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedu1es A-J]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Redact]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Redact (Fee Per Case)]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Intent]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedu1es A-J]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.