U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30410
  • Case Name: Vickie Lynn Huxsahl
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2018
  • October 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.