U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07037
  • Case Name: Velde v. Vogel Law Firm, Ltd. d/b/a The Vogel Firm
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • December 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • December 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Plaintiff]
  • December 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • December 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • October 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • September 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • August 23, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • August 08, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • August 08, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • July 11, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • July 11, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • July 11, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pay AP Filing Fee]
  • July 11, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.