U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07038
  • Case Name: Doeling v. Warner
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • September 14, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Affidavit]
  • August 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • July 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • July 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • July 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • July 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.